74 Bo-Bo
BR (1st) | BR (Main) | BR (74 Pre-TOPS) | BR (74 TOPS) | Date To Service | Rebuilt From | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
E5000 | E5024 | E6104 | 74004 | 24/12/1958 | 02/1968 from 71 |
Stewarts Lane | 12/1977 | 19 | 19.65 | |||||
E5003 | E6107 | 74007 | 20/03/1959 | 31/03/1968 from 71 |
Stewarts Lane | 12/1977 | 18.75 | 19.42 | ||||||
E5005 | E6108 | 74008 | 12/05/1959 | 04/1968 from 71 |
Stewarts Lane | 12/1977 | 18.58 | 19.27 | ||||||
E5006 | E6103 | 74003 | 02/06/1959 | 10/12/1967 from 71 |
Stewarts Lane | 12/1977 | 18.5 | 21.55 | ||||||
E5015 | E6101 | 74001 | 20/02/1960 | 02/1968 from 71 |
Stewarts Lane | 12/1977 | 17.83 | 18.50 | ||||||
E5016 | E6102 | 74002 | 05/04/1960 | 11/1967 from 71 |
Stewarts Lane | 06/1977 | 17.17 | 17.71 | ||||||
E5017 | E6109 | 74009 | 23/03/1960 | 04/1968 from 71 |
Stewarts Lane | 12/1977 | 17.75 | 18.41 | ||||||
E5019 | E6105 | 74005 | 17/05/1960 | 10/03/1968 from 71 |
Stewarts Lane | 12/1977 | 17.58 | 20.68 | ||||||
E5021 | E6110 | 74010 | 25/07/1960 | 05/1968 from 71 |
Stewarts Lane | 12/1977 | 17.42 | 19.24 | ||||||
E5023 | E6106 | 74006 | 25/10/1960 | 17/03/1968 from 71 |
Stewarts Lane | 06/1976 | 15.67 | 16.65 |