Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 914 Today
» 5648 Yesterday
» 17777 Week
» 8833 Month
» 355257 Year
» 3382110 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
HR/LMS Cumming "4F" Class 4-6-0
HR |
LMS |
BR |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Mileage |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
75
|
17950
|
57950
|
04/1918 |
|
08/1950 |
|
32.33 |
829,700 |
|
|
|
32.27 |
76
|
17951
|
57951
|
04/1918 |
|
24/05/1951 |
|
33.08 |
854,924 |
|
|
|
|
77
|
17952
|
|
05/1918 |
|
09/1946 |
|
28.33 |
705,733 |
|
|
|
|
78
|
17953
|
57953
|
06/1918 |
|
18/09/1948 |
|
30.25 |
819,458 |
|
|
|
|
79
|
17954
|
57954
|
10/1919 |
|
13/10/1952 |
|
33 |
875,000 |
|
|
|
36.19 |
80
|
17955
|
57955
|
10/1919 |
|
27/06/1952 |
|
32.67 |
765,458 |
|
|
|
|
81
|
17956
|
57956
|
11/1916 |
|
27/05/1952 |
|
35.5 |
880,000 |
|
|
|
33.85 |
82
|
17957
|
|
11/1919 |
|
03/1946 |
|
26.33 |
717,711 |
|
|
|
|