Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2142 Today
» 3791 Yesterday
» 11086 Week
» 2142 Month
» 348566 Year
» 3375419 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
LMS Stanier "PRIN" Class 4-6-2 - 'Lizzies'
Class |
LMS |
BR |
Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Modification |
Modification Date |
PRIN |
6200
|
46200
|
27/06/1933 |
17/11/1962 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
30/11/1957 |
PRIN |
6201
|
46201
|
03/11/1933 |
20/10/1962 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
05/10/1957 |
PRIN |
6203
|
46203
|
01/07/1935 |
20/10/1962 |
Speedometer fitted |
13/06/1959 |
PRIN |
6204
|
46204
|
19/07/1935 |
07/10/1961 |
Speedometer fitted |
13/06/1959 |
PRIN |
6205
|
46205
|
24/07/1935 |
25/11/1961 |
Speedometer fitted |
28/11/1959 |
PRIN |
6206
|
46206
|
01/08/1935 |
03/11/1962 |
Speedometer fitted |
18/04/1959 |
PRIN |
6207
|
46207
|
09/08/1935 |
25/11/1961 |
Speedometer fitted |
21/03/1959 |
PRIN |
6208
|
46208
|
16/08/1935 |
20/10/1962 |
Speedometer fitted |
03/10/1959 |
PRIN |
6209
|
46209
|
23/08/1935 |
29/09/1962 |
Speedometer fitted |
13/06/1959 |
PRIN |
6210
|
46210
|
06/09/1935 |
07/10/1961 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
05/10/1957 |
PRIN |
6211
|
46211
|
18/09/1935 |
07/10/1961 |
Speedometer fitted |
21/03/1959 |
PRIN |
6212
|
46212
|
21/10/1935 |
07/10/1961 |
Speedometer fitted |
13/06/1959 |