Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 3510 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34160 Week
» 132805 Month
» 335469 Year
» 3362322 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1328 |
m/e |
12/1906 |
British Railways |
31328 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
H |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 12/1906 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 25/02/1961 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 2 mths , 26 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STL |
St Leonards |
5w/e |
04/02/1950 |
ALLOC |
74C |
Dover Marine |
8w/e |
19/03/1952 |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
5w/e |
08/07/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
25/02/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
19/04/1947 |
Bricklayers Arms Works |
The Works at Bricklayers' Arms contained only five engines, Nos. 1231, 1328, 1386, 2166 and 21C127. Nos. 1261 and 1386 were without tenders, but one tender was also in the shop. The other one was outside. |
SLS/194706 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1906 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1328 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31328 |
|
|
04/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (STL) |
|
|
19/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) |
|
|
08/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
25/02/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31328 |
|
|
04/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|