Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 1224 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 1224 Week
» 136040 Month
» 338704 Year
» 3365557 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1487 |
m/e |
07/1902 |
British Railways |
31487 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
D1 |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 07/1902 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 25/02/1961 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 7 mths , 26 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1487 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Faversham (FAV) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31487 |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Faversham (FAV) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Faversham (73E) |
|
|
19/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D) |
|
|
08/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
25/02/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31487 |
|
|
04/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|