Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1325 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 1325 Week
» 136141 Month
» 338805 Year
» 3365658 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2480 |
m/e |
12/1898 |
British Railways |
32480 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 12/1898 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/11/1959 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 11 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
3Br |
Three Bridges |
P |
02/01/1948 |
TOSTORE |
75E |
Three Bridges |
5w/e |
16/09/1955 |
REINS |
75D |
Horsham |
P |
31/10/1956 |
ALLOC |
75A |
Brighton |
7w/e |
10/04/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/05/1947 |
Ashford Works |
Locos. entering Works during the period 4/5/47 to 31/5/47 included: 1123, 1164, 1309, 1319, 1380, 1384, 1403, 1407, 1508, 1573, 1595, 2408, 2454, 2459, 2480, 2482, 2485, 2491, 2499 and W.D. 78563. |
SLS/194708 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1898 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2480 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Three Bridges (3B ) |
|
|
02/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (3B ) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32480 |
|
|
17/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Horsham (75D) |
|
|
22/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
11/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32480 |
|
|