Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 249 Today
» 5422 Yesterday
» 21283 Week
» 119928 Month
» 322592 Year
» 3349445 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
C24 |
m/e |
06/1942 |
British Railways |
33024 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
O. Bulleid |
Class |
Q1 |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 06/1942 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 25/08/1963 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 2 mths , 25 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/11/1951 |
Didcot, Newbury & Southampton line |
There is a new through goods working from Didcot to Eastleigh, via Winchester, a G.W. 2-8-0 usually alternating with a Ql. On 6th November, 2816 came to Eastleigh and 33024 went to Didcot. |
SLS/195201 |
05/09/1961 |
Eastleigh MPD (71A) (out of use) |
On 5th September the following were noted out of use either waiting works or cutting up-30029/44/120/83/258/87/530/82/4/668/74/701/82/3/93, 30800/50/1/2/5/8, 31061/493/2103/3024/38/4099, 41312, 73051, 76009, 80039/40, 82014 and GW 4610. Ex-Works were 30072/494/2353/4091 an 80016 together with 3620 (81C) and 3633 with 87C plate but with S.R. brackets newly fitted to smokebox door to take GW lamps as well as SR. 92052 (18A) was also on shed. |
SLS/196110 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1942 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number C24 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 33024 |
|
|
29/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D) |
|
|
10/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
24/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
25/08/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 33024 |
|
|
06/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|