Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 419 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 419 Week
» 135235 Month
» 337899 Year
» 3364752 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8441 |
on |
06/06/1944 |
British Railways |
48441 |
w/e |
11/02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
353 |
To Service |
Sat 06/06/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 06/04/1968 |
Service Life |
23 yrs , 10 mths |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/06/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8441 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Goole (25C) |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (18D) |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (2C) |
|
|
11/02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48441 |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
31/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (2E) |
|
|
16/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
12/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Darwen (10H) |
|
|
19/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F) |
|
|
06/04/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48441 |
|
|
07/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|