|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/12/1960 | Horwich Works (Works Yard) | Works Yard: 40173, 43023, 44125, 44262, 44602, 48084/9, 48130/88/97, 48249/54, 48457/69, 48664, 48747, 49505, 51498, 52305. Cutting-up Yard: 51227, 52139/79, 52445/52. Erecting Shop: Frames for three new diesel shunters, 12010, 40089, 40120/48, 42649, 42701/59/60/71/85, 42859, 43047, 43122, 43931, 44018 (marked to be cut-up), 44292, 44309/41, 44458, 48082, 48152/9/63, 48247/74, 48340, 48709/21, 76078/85. Paint Shop: uM28341/83M, F.R.3, L.Y.R. 1008. Works Shunters: 11304/5/24/68, 47402, 51429. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/10/1944 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8457 Built at Swindon Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B) | ||
24/04/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48457 | ||
15/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
06/03/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) | ||
09/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48457 | ||
02/1967 | Scrapped | Scrapped |