|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
15/11/1964 | Crewe South MPD (Ex-Works) | Ex-Works: 45392, 48458, 48721/45, 92231; Waiting Works: 42468, 42588, 42616, 44773, 45300, 45733, 47354, 47467, 46499, 48001, 48385, 48505, 48697, 48708, 70001/39, 80125, 92160; Stored: 43151, 45553, 45586; Also on shed: 5063, 6819/77, 7023, 7914. | SLS/196412 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/11/1944 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8458 Built at Swindon Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Rose Grove (24B) | ||
12/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G) | ||
12/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) | ||
24/12/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48458 | ||
23/04/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) | ||
08/04/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48458 | ||
10/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |