Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 4746 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 35396 Week
» 134041 Month
» 336705 Year
» 3363558 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8681 |
m/e |
01/1944 |
British Railways |
48681 |
w/e |
25/02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 01/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 22/07/1967 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 6 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1968 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1944 |
18A |
|
Toton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
16F |
|
Burton |
w/e |
07/08/1965 |
8E |
|
Northwich |
w/e |
24/09/1966 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
22/07/1967 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
16F |
Burton |
4w/e |
07/08/1965 |
ALLOC |
8E |
Northwich |
4w/e |
08/10/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
22/07/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8681 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Toton (18A) |
|
|
25/02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48681 |
|
|
07/08/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (16F) |
|
|
24/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (8E) |
|
|
22/07/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48681 |
|
|
03/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|