Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 411 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 411 Week
» 135227 Month
» 337891 Year
» 3364744 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7657 |
m/e |
07/1944 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3106 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) |
3506 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8711 |
m/e |
11/1947 |
British Railways |
48711 |
w/e |
31/12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 07/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/01/1967 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 6 mths , 8 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
01/02/1959 |
Rugby Works |
42677(5A), 45256(8A), 45615/77, 48711 (8E), 73157(14D), 80082(1E), 92032(16D), 90080(2F). |
SLS/195903 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 7657 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3106 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3506 |
|
|
11/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8711 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rose Grove (24B) |
|
|
26/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
31/12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48711 |
|
|
04/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Accrington (24A) |
|
|
11/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Accrington (24A) |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
13/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (9G) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (9G) |
|
|
10/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
07/01/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48711 |
|
|
06/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|