|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/11/1965 | Crewe Works (Side of Works) | Main Erecting shop: 42249, 44690, 44761, 45021/150, 48176/214/53/78/92, 48544, 48775, 70010/25/6/9/53. 92012, D181, D208/15/21/89/97, D311/32/82/98, D1518/32/42/50/7/60/7/84/97, D1980-9. Electric shop: E3014/45/7/51/86, 26002/8, 27002. New Diesel Repair Shop: D153, D1534/70/82, D1683, D1717/76, D1843/60. Test Area: D1536/72, D1976, D5705/14. Traverser Area: 45421, 48545, 70013, 26027, E3060, D376/7, D1516/23/8/68, D1646/89, D1715, D1849, D5244, D5716. Side of Works: 48744, 70047, 92117/228, E3052. Paint shop: D1974/5/7/8/9, 46235, D305/58, E3054/97, D5709. Outside paint shop: 44809, 48033, 92063 re-painted, D347, D1541, D1634, D1770, D5710. | SLS/196512 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3139 | ||
02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3539 | ||
09/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8744 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B) | ||
14/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) | ||
03/06/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48744 | ||
07/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Longsight (9A) | ||
17/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Longsight (9A) | ||
26/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) | ||
19/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) | ||
08/01/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9L) | ||
09/03/1968 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bolton (9K) | ||
16/03/1968 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48744 | ||
07/1968 | Scrapped | Scrapped |