Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 1701 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 27735 Week
» 126380 Month
» 329044 Year
» 3355897 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
1500 |
on |
24/06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Hawksworth |
Class |
15xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
373 |
To Service |
Mon 24/06/1949 to Old Oak Common (PDN) |
Withdrawal |
Mon 02/12/1963 |
Service Life |
14 yrs, 5 mths , 8 dys |
Total Mileage |
166,933 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
NYA |
|
m/e |
30/06/1949 |
1STALLOC |
PDN |
Old Oak Common |
m/e |
31/08/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
30/11/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/06/1949 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 1500 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) |
|
|
02/12/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1500 |
|
|
05/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|