Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2990 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 29024 Week
» 127669 Month
» 330333 Year
» 3357186 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
1617 |
on |
14/12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Hawksworth |
Class |
16xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
381 |
To Service |
Wed 14/12/1949 to Oxford (OXF) |
Withdrawal |
Wed 13/11/1963 |
Service Life |
13 yrs, 10 mths , 30 dys |
Total Mileage |
218,684 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1964 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
OXF |
|
Oxford (New) |
on |
14/12/1949 |
85C |
|
Hereford |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
13/11/1963 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
OXF |
Oxford |
m/e |
31/12/1949 |
ALLOC |
85C |
Hereford |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
30/11/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/12/1949 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 1617 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Oxford (OXF) |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hereford (85C) |
|
|
13/11/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1617 |
|
|
03/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|