Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1594 Today
» 5153 Yesterday
» 6747 Week
» 141563 Month
» 344227 Year
» 3371080 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1729 |
09/04/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47137 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Brush Traction, Loughborough |
Works Number |
491 |
To Service |
09/04/1964 to Landore (87E) |
Withdrawn |
03/08/1987 |
Time in Service |
23 yrs, 3 mths , 25 dys |
Cut Up |
on 23/03/1992 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Information |
Carried worksplate '500' but on paper it was '491' |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
09/04/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
10/1971 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
09/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1979 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/04/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
10/1971 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
WR ATC |
|
|
09/1975 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
WR ATC |
|
|
by 03/1979 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
xih |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/04/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1729 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 491 Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
06/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
16/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
10/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47137 |
|
|
09/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
03/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
03/08/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47137 |
|
|
23/03/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|