Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 809 Today
» 5648 Yesterday
» 17672 Week
» 8728 Month
» 355152 Year
» 3382005 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D176 |
14/08/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
46039 |
01/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
46 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 3 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
14/08/1962 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
23/10/1983 |
Time in Service |
21 yrs, 2 mths , 9 dys |
Cut Up |
on 03/08/1985 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with small yellow panels and white bodyside band at base of body. |
14/08/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/07/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/08/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
11/07/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
27/07/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/08/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D176 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
31/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
20/03/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46039 |
|
|
23/10/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46039 |
|
|
03/08/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|