Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 36 Online
» 2655 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33305 Week
» 131950 Month
» 334614 Year
» 3361467 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1816 |
09/02/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47335 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
09/02/1965 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 06/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/02/1965 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/02/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1816 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 578 Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47335 |
|
|
28/02/2007 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47335 |
|
|
30/06/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury |
|
|