Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 1958 Today
» 3791 Yesterday
» 10902 Week
» 1958 Month
» 348382 Year
» 3375235 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1881 |
18/06/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47362 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
18/06/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/06/1965 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 15/02/1969 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/06/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1881 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 643 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47362 |
|
|
12/2000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan |
|
|