Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2544 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 2544 Week
» 137360 Month
» 340024 Year
» 3366877 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1916 |
18/11/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47239 |
04/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47657 |
10/10/1986 |
|
TOPS (47/8) |
47812 |
31/07/1989 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
18/11/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/11/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
08/1975 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/11/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1916 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 678 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47239 |
|
|
08/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
10/10/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47657 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
31/07/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47812 |
|
|