Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 4557 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 30591 Week
» 129236 Month
» 331900 Year
» 3358753 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
2000 |
m/e |
12/1891 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Armstrong |
Class |
1901 |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road) |
Order Number |
Y2 |
Works Number |
542 |
To Service |
During 12/1891 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 29/12/1949 |
Service Life |
58 yrs , 29 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1891 |
CV.AYN |
|
Abercynon |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
29/12/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
AYN |
Abercynon |
m/e |
31/12/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1904 |
Diagram R4 boiler fitted |
03/1923 |
Diagram B4 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
02/11/1959 |
Brecon demotion |
Brecon's allocation was divided from 2nd November, 1959-2219/36, 3638, 3706/47/67, 7794 to Newport (86A) and 46506/16/8/9/20/1/2 to Oswestry (89A) thus making the shed an overnight stabling depot. |
SLS/196002 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1891 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2000 Built at Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road), Works Number 542 |
|
|
10/1904 |
Modification |
Diagram R4 boiler fitted |
|
|
03/1923 |
Modification |
Diagram B4 boiler fitted |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Abercynon (CV.AYN) |
|
|
29/12/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2000 |
|
|