|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/10/1948 | Crewe Works | The remaining nine 2-6-2T's of Order E471 are now in traffic. They were completed on the following dates:-Nos. 41221 (9/9), 41222 (13/9), 41223 (16/9), 41224 (21/9), 41225 (24/9), 41226 (28/9), 41227 (30/9), 41228 (5/10), and 41229 (8/10). The construction of a further batch of '2F' 2-6-0's is now well under way and the first five engines were completed as follows:-Nos. 46420 (14/10), 46421 (26/10), 46422 (22/10), 46423 (29/10), and 46424 (2/11). Three more 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0's have been rebuilt with tapered boilers-No. 45523 was completed on 20/9, No. 45545 on 8/10 and No 45536 on 26/10; No. 45545 has been named Planet. Another 'Royal Scot,' No. 6167, is at present in for rebuilding and - will probably be in traffic by the middle of December. During the past two months Nos. 44829/30 an 48064 have had their oil-burning apparatus removed, which seems to indicate that the other locomotives so fitted will be similarly dealt with as they pass through the shops. The ranks of ex L.N.W.R. engines continue to be steadily thinned and many more have gone to the scrap heap recently, they were cut up as follows:-W.E. 7/8 Nos. 6653/89, 7959, 28535; W.E. 14/8 Nos. 6870, 9270; W.E. 21/8 Nos. 28097, 28367, 28586; W.E. 28/8 Nos. 7948, 9309, 28088; W.E. 4/9 Nos. 7787, 8913, 28234; W.E. 11/9 Nos. 7756, 9136; WE. 18/9 Nos. 6691, 7840; W.E. 25/9 Nos. 7816, 27556, 28104; W.E. 2/10 No. 7721; W.E. 9/10 Nos. 7703, 28404; W.E. 16/10 Nos. 9152, 9165, 27681; W.E. 23/10 Nos. 7733, 28262, 28313, 28608; W.E. 30/10 No. 7954. During October considerable interest was aroused here by the arrival of five ex G.W.R. 0-6-0 pannier tanks Nos. 2021/67, 2115/50/85. These engines are at present undergoing repair and it is understood that more are to follow. |
SLS/194812 |
31/01/1949 | Crewe Works | Locomotives entering Works during January included Nos. C.D. No. 7, 2236, 2428/46/53/74, 2562/79/80/98, 2624/74/85/86, 4777, 4812/23/68/76, 4965, 5103/6/29/49, 5200/22/84/94, 5317/18/53/54/72/75/83, 5427/49, 5516/24/94/98, 5650/65/84, 5719, 6111/18/22/28/45/46/64, 6204/50, 7181, 7937/51/73/81/85, 8007/80/93/96, 8177/99, 8220/5, 8327/38/45/47, 8417/24/35/42, 8501/2, 8607/28/49, 8705/23/70, 8892/4, 8909/35, 9217/27/90, 9386, 25673, 27591, 27635, 28337, 42150, 42225, 42458, 42589, 42619, 44753/66, 44822/70, 45027/76, 45513/30/65/72/89, 45618/60/85, 45721, 46220/21/29/39, 46603, 48004, 48114, 49307. During the past month new construction accounted for a further six Class '5' 4-6-0's of Order E472. They were completed as follows:- Nos. 44729 (7/1), 44730 (12/1), 44731 (17/1), 44732 (24/1), 44733 (28/1) and 44734 (3/2); the last three engines of this order are already in an advanced state of completion. The latest 'Patriot' Class 4-6-0 to be rebuilt is No. 45522-completed on 21/1; at the present time no more are in hand. Since the cessation of hostilities the former L.M.S.Rly. have fitted several different types of speedometer to certain of their 4-6-0 locomotives. These experiments were carried a stage further last month when during W.E. 22/1 Class '7P' No. 46257 was fitted with a Smiths type speedometer driven from the pony truck axle, the generator being mounted on the left-hand axlebox. Ex L.N.W. 'Cauliflower' 0-6-0's. Nos. 58409/12 were fitted for snowplough duties during the same week. The equipment includes ex-tended cab roofs, and look-out windows (similar to those seen on many brake vans) mounted on the cab sides. Since October last, several 'Dean' 0-6-0 pannier tanks have undergone heavy repairs here; those having passed through Works to date include Nos. 2021/67, 2100/09/11/15/27/50/84/85. All have had their numberplates painted red, with the numerals scoured bright. Another ex L. & Y. 0-6-0ST has been added to the stud of Works' shunting locomotives-No. 11444, which now brings the total of ex L. & Y. engines represented to three. |
SLS/194903 |
02/11/1959 | Brecon demotion | Brecon's allocation was divided from 2nd November, 1959-2219/36, 3638, 3706/47/67, 7794 to Newport (86A) and 46506/16/8/9/20/1/2 to Oswestry (89A) thus making the shed an overnight stabling depot. | SLS/196002 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1902 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 2115 Built at Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road) |
||
02/1913 | Modification | Diagram B4 boiler fitted | ||
03/1913 | Modification | Modification: Rebuilt with pannier tanks | ||
10/1923 | Modification | Diagram BR0 boiler fitted | ||
08/1928 | Modification | Diagram B4 boiler fitted | ||
11/01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lydney (LYD) | ||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Worcester (WOS) | ||
05/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hereford (HFD) | ||
09/09/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Worcester (85A) | ||
30/09/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Worcester (85A) | ||
23/06/1952 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 2115 |