Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1599 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 1599 Week
» 136415 Month
» 339079 Year
» 3365932 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2131 |
02/02/1960 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
03 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
To Service |
02/02/1960 to Taunton (83B) |
Withdrawn |
06/07/1968 |
Time in Service |
8 yrs, 5 mths , 4 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 11/1968 |
Cut At |
Cohens (Kettering) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/02/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/02/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2131 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Taunton (83B) |
|
|
26/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exeter (83C) |
|
|
13/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
31/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
06/07/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2131 |
|
|
11/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|