Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 3243 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 33893 Week
» 132538 Month
» 335202 Year
» 3362055 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11132 |
30/10/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2226 |
10/03/1962 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/10/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/10/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11132 Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd. Allocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
10/03/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2226 |
|
|
18/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
13/04/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2226 |
|
|
08/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|