Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2942 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 2942 Week
» 137758 Month
» 340422 Year
» 3367275 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
2296 |
on |
03/06/1938 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
2251 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
312 |
To Service |
Mon 03/06/1938 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 12/10/1959 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 4 mths , 9 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/06/1938 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2296 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tyseley (TYS) |
|
|
05/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS) |
|
|
25/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
20/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Croes Newydd (84J) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
30/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
31/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Croes Newydd (84J) |
|
|
05/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neyland (87H) |
|
|
02/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
21/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) |
|
|
12/10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2296 |
|
|
01/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|