Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2542 Today
» 4203 Yesterday
» 23961 Week
» 46932 Month
» 393356 Year
» 3420209 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2308 |
06/12/1960 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/12/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/12/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2308 Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd. Allocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
28/05/1967 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
22/10/1967 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
03/02/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2308 |
|
|
05/1980 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Duport Steels: Llanelli |
|
|