Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 822 Today
» 5648 Yesterday
» 17685 Week
» 8741 Month
» 355165 Year
» 3382018 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2331 |
01/07/1961 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/07/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/07/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2331 Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd. Allocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
19/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
08/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
01/07/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2331 |
|
|
11/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton |
|
|