Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 708 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1655 Week
» 20437 Month
» 268730 Year
» 1153111 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2410 19/06/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 06
Wheels 0-4-0
Builder Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Cost when Built £
To Service 19/06/1958
Withdrawn 02/1969
Time in Service 10 yrs, 7 mths , 12 dys
Cut Up 01/06/1969
Cut At Campbells (Airdrie)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
60A Inverness (New) 19/06/1958
66C Hamilton (West) 4w/e 27/06/1964
65A Eastfield 4w/e 27/01/1968
   Withdrawn 02/1969


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
19/06/1958 To Service To service as D2410
Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock
Allocated to Inverness (60A)
   
27/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C)    
27/01/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
02/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D2410    
01/06/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie    

prev