Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 29 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 30679 Week
» 129324 Month
» 331988 Year
» 3358841 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and South Western Railway |
243 |
m/e |
03/1897 |
British Railways |
30243 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
M7 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
Order Number |
M7 |
To Service |
During 03/1897 |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1958 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 6 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1958 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
4w/e |
13/04/1951 |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
m/e |
30/06/1952 |
TOSTORE |
70A |
Nine Elms |
3w/e |
10/10/1955 |
REINS |
70A |
Nine Elms |
8w/e |
05/06/1956 |
ALLOC |
70B |
Feltham |
q/e |
08/10/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
2w/e |
13/10/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1897 |
To Service |
To service as London and South Western Railway Number 243 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30243 |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
13/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
30/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
08/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
09/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30243 |
|
|
09/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|