Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1185 Today
» 5422 Yesterday
» 22219 Week
» 120864 Month
» 323528 Year
» 3350381 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D314 |
29/12/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40114 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
29/12/1960 to Crewe North (5A) |
Withdrawn |
05/10/1980 |
Time in Service |
19 yrs, 9 mths , 6 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 08/1982 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
29/12/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/12/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
03/1977 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/12/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D314 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
14/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
18/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
19/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (1F) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
07/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40114 |
|
|
03/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
03/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KD) |
|
|
05/10/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40114 |
|
|
08/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|