Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2133 Today
» 3791 Yesterday
» 11077 Week
» 2133 Month
» 348557 Year
» 3375410 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3460 |
21/06/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08375 |
28/01/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/06/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
21/06/1957 |
Power Unit IH3843 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/06/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3460 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
23/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
05/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
17/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
14/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selhurst (75C) |
|
|
28/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (HG) |
|
|
28/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08375 |
|
|
08/11/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08375 from Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|