Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 4277 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34927 Week
» 133572 Month
» 336236 Year
» 3363089 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway |
21C13 |
m/e |
02/1945 |
British Railways |
35013 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
O. Bulleid |
Class |
Merchant Navy |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-6-2 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 02/1945 |
Withdrawal |
During 02/1967 |
Service Life |
22 yrs |
Total Mileage |
1,114,658 |
Information |
Rebuilt Eastleigh Feb 1957 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1968 |
Tenders
Type |
Number |
From |
Company |
Water |
Coal |
MN Series 2 |
3123 |
02/1945 |
SR |
5,100g |
5t 0cwt |
MN Series 2 |
3124 |
08/1950 |
SR |
5,100g |
5t 0cwt |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1952 |
Original cab replaced with revised model |
05/1956 |
Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1945 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 21C13 Built at Eastleigh Works Tender fitted: MN Series 2 |
|
|
17/04/1945 |
Naming |
Named 'BLUE FUNNEL' |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 35013 |
|
|
08/1950 |
Tender |
Tender fitted: MN Series 2 number 3124 |
|
|
12/1952 |
Modification |
Modification: Original cab replaced with revised model |
|
|
19/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
05/1956 |
Modification |
Modification: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc... |
|
|
06/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F) |
|
|
17/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (70G) |
|
|
02/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 35013 |
|
|
17/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
04/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|