Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 448 Today
» 3791 Yesterday
» 9392 Week
» 448 Month
» 346872 Year
» 3373725 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Brighton and South Coast Railway |
332 |
m/e |
09/1922 |
Southern Railway (Rblds) |
2332 |
on |
28/11/1935 |
British Railways |
32332 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
28/11/1935 |
STROUDLEY |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
N15X |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-6-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 09/1922 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/01/1956 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 4 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1956 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1922 |
BAS |
|
Basingstoke |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
14/01/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
BAS |
Basingstoke |
m/e |
30/06/1947 |
TOSTORE |
UNK |
|
10w/e |
07/10/1952 |
TOSTORE |
70D |
Basingstoke |
4w/e |
08/01/1953 |
REINS |
70D |
Basingstoke |
3w/e |
27/03/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
14/01/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1922 |
To Service |
To service as London, Brighton and South Coast Railway Number 332 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
28/11/1935 |
Naming |
Named 'STROUDLEY' |
|
|
28/11/1935 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2332 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Basingstoke (BAS) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32332 |
|
|
01/1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
14/01/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32332 |
|
|