Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 2115 Today
» 3791 Yesterday
» 11059 Week
» 2115 Month
» 348539 Year
» 3375392 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3478 |
16/01/1958 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
26/02/1963 |
|
Oil Control Piston Rings |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/01/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Stratford Works |
|
n/a |
12/05/1958 |
06/06/1958 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
26 days |
|
|
|
Doncaster Works |
|
n/a |
21/09/1961 |
05/12/1961 |
General |
|
|
|
76 days |
|
34,819 |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/01/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3478 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
12/05/1958 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/05/1958. Dep: 06/06/1958. |
|
|
01/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D) |
|
|
29/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
21/09/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1961. Dep: 05/12/1961. |
|
|
26/02/1963 |
Modification |
Modification: Oil Control Piston Rings |
|
|
05/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
07/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
05/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
30/06/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3478 |
|
|
07/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|