Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 390 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1775 Week
» 8580 Month
» 115526 Year
» 1337091 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 3784 m/e 08/1938

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 08/1938
Withdrawal During 06/1965
Scrapping During 10/1965
Service Life 26 yrs , 10 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 09/10/1954
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 29/01/1955
82A Bristol Bath Road 8w/e 26/03/1955
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 06/10/1956
88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 31/12/1960
88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
88C Barry 4w/e 02/11/1963
88B Radyr 6w/e 12/10/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 11/09/1954
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 86C Hereford 4w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
ALLOC 88C Barry 5w/e 02/11/1963
ALLOC 88G Llantrisant 3w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 88B Radyr w/e 12/10/1964
WDN   03/06/1965
WDN   4w/e 13/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1938 To Service To service as GWR Number 3784
Built at Swindon Works
   
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
29/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
26/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
31/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88B)    
06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 3784    

prev prev