Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 35 Online
» 1287 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31937 Week
» 130582 Month
» 333246 Year
» 3360099 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3894 |
27/07/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08726 |
01/12/1973 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/07/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
01/03/1975 |
Eastfield shed visit |
Eastfield |
On shed |
|
Bruce Strong, Facebook |
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/07/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3894 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
19/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
01/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08726 |
|
|
01/12/1980 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
26/01/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08726 from Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
05/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: at Thornton Yard |
|
|