Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 4869 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 35519 Week
» 134164 Month
» 336828 Year
» 3363681 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3929 |
01/03/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08761 |
12/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/03/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
03/1971 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/03/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3929 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Ardrossan (67D) |
|
|
27/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
27/03/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee West (62B) |
|
|
27/03/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
29/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
28/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee West (62B) |
|
|
12/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08761 |
|
|
20/03/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08761 from Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
03/10/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|