|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1949 | Crewe Works | During the past month a further seven Class '5' 4-6-0's-Nos. 44718-24 inclusive-have been put into traffic, painted black with red, cream and grey lining but carrying neither lettering nor crests on the tender sides. No. 46202 recently returned to traffic. The engine was run in on trips from Crewe to Shrewsbury during W/E 19/3, and returned to the regular London-Liverpool working the following week. Since then, however, it is reported to have failed again at Camden, details are not known. Dynamometer car trials were carried out with Class '4' 2-6-0 No. 43027 on the Crewe-Holyhead line during W/E 9/4; the dynamometer car used was No. 1. Locomotives entering Works during March included:-Nos. 42227/52, 2263/66, 2432/54/80, 2541/44/63, 2611/13/42/50/57/60/73, 44745, 4775, 4819/72/97, 4911/39/63, 44984, 5046/54/88, 45091, 5110/45, 45195, 45229/34, 5244, 45264, 5269/96/7/8, 45326, 5343/82/84, 5408, 5501, 45520, 5556, 45568, 5591, 45597, 5659/70, 45676/90/99, 5703/35, 6004, 46100, 6103/10/13/21, 46134, 6155/56, 46160/63, 6169, 6206/27, 46231, 6235/50/1/2/5, 7972, 47982, 7994/95, 8026/75, 8112/50/57, 8206/70, 8301/2/3/17/24/31/50/61/67, 8495, 8522, 8610/45/91, 48696, 8770, 8906/18, 9042/52/74, 9110/11/66/85, 9210/59/63/89/96/97, 9305/29/40/63/81, 9419/27/29, 28619, 58889 and 2-10-0 73788 (65F). |
SLS/194905 |
31/01/1958 | Locomotive Statement | 4056 was the last ' Star' in service: 30738 remains the sole survivor of the 30736-55. series: 32331 was the last of the rebuilt 'Remembrance' N15IX class. Renewed scrapping of the GW. 90XX class has taken place: the NE. D20 class is now extinct: the, wholesale withdrawal of the D49 class appears to have begun. The V4 class is now extinct. Three G.E. ' Intermediates' (62785/8/97) are all that remain of this wheel-type. 52510 was the last Furness locomotive: 30688 was the first of its class to be scrapped, following an accident at Staines. The A7 class is now extinct: the first two A8 have been withdrawn. 47994 is the sole Garratt survivor. The GW. 31XX class is now reduced to five. All the remaining Rhymney and Taff. Vale engines have now gone: the LBSC E6 class is no longer intact: the first two NB N15 have been withdrawn: 30757 was the last representative of the PD & SWJR. Withdrawals of the GW 67XX, 77XX and 87XX have begun; the 54XX are rapidly disappearing: only two N.L. engines (58850/7) remain. The M.R. representatives now number four only. 30588 was the last of its class: 68126 was the last GE Y4 in capital stock. D-E. Standard shunters continue to be built very rapidly, Crewe and Doncaster having joined Derby and Darlington in their production. Further new classes of main line locomotives have appeared and several more are due for delivery early in 1958. D-M. Swindon has now joined the various contractors in turning out the standard small shunting type. These locos. will in future (with the exception of d11176) bear numbers in the D.2XXX series. | SLS/195803 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1930 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4994 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 6675 |
||
1938 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7994 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Toton (18A) | ||
04/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 47994 | ||
24/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) | ||
28/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) | ||
04/12/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Toton (18A) | ||
29/12/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hasland (18C) | ||
14/03/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 47994 | ||
04/1958 | Scrapped | Scrapped |