Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1015 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31665 Week
» 130310 Month
» 332974 Year
» 3359827 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Caledonian Railway |
151 |
m/e |
03/1906 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
15176 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
55176 |
y/e |
1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. McIntosh |
Class |
439 |
Company History |
CR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
St. Rollox Works |
Order Number |
Y77 |
To Service |
During 03/1906 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 10/10/1958 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 7 mths , 11 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1906 |
29A |
|
Perth South |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
63C |
|
Forfar |
4w/e |
26/12/1953 |
63B |
|
Stirling |
8w/e |
09/07/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
10/10/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
63C |
Forfar |
4w/e |
26/12/1953 |
ALLOC |
63B |
Stirling |
4w/e |
09/07/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/10/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/04/1950 |
Inverurie Works |
Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 61539/60, 62277, 4486, 65215/31, 5271, 5318, 67455, ex-L.M.S. 40670, 15176, 15269, 17241, 17396, 17609. |
SLS/195006 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1906 |
To Service |
To service as Caledonian Railway Number 151 Built at St. Rollox Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 15176 |
|
|
1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 55176 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Perth South (29A) |
|
|
26/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Forfar (63C) |
|
|
09/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stirling (63B) |
|
|
10/10/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 55176 |
|
|