Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3365 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34015 Week
» 132660 Month
» 335324 Year
» 3362177 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Caledonian Railway |
462 |
m/e |
06/1911 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
15212 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
55212 |
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. McIntosh |
Class |
439 |
Company History |
CR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
St. Rollox Works |
Order Number |
Y96 |
To Service |
During 06/1911 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 04/12/1958 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 6 mths , 3 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1911 |
31B |
|
Stirling |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
63A |
|
Perth South |
w/e |
01/04/1950 |
63B |
|
Stirling |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
|
|
Unknown - please contact administrator! |
4w/e |
29/11/1952 |
63A |
|
Perth South |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
04/12/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
63A |
Perth South |
w/e |
01/04/1950 |
ALLOC |
63B |
Stirling |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
ALLOC |
99I |
|
4w/e |
29/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
63A |
Perth South |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
04/12/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1948 |
St. Rollox Works |
Further locomotives re-numbered into British Railways stock here (tender number in brackets, followed by paint date) are as follows:-Nos. *40667 (3778) 7/9; 42878 (4171) 5/9; 44878 (9362) 20/9; 44968 (10593) 5/9; 44979 (10604) 8/9; 45015 (9473) 29/9; 45155 (10547) 10/9; 45156 (9260) 14/9; 45169 (9169) 21/9; 45173 (9277) 15/9; 45213 (9317) 19/9; 45355 (9827) 9/9; 45366 (9602) 13/9; 45443 (9271) 6/9; *45461 (9717) 8/9; 45477 (9823) 22/9; 45478 (9824) 22/9; 45643 (10503) 19/9; *54453 (6052) 24/9; 54649 (2680) 13/9; 55166 9/9; *55159 15/9; 55201 21/9; 55212 8/9; 56340 28/9; 56368 29/9; *57247 (885) 24/9. *Retains L.M.S. on tank or tender sides. With the exception of Nos. 45461, 54453 and 54649, all of the foregoing are fitted with new smokebox number-plates. Commencing on 5/9, the colour of the numbers and letters was changed from white to cream; the original dimensions being retained. Several locomotives have been treated with a full paint schedule-three undercoats, one coat of enamel and two coats of varnish. The first to be dealt with was No. **57360 (876), which was completed in the Erecting Shop during W/E 11/9, but subsequent engines have been sent to the Varnish Shop for completion as follows:-Nos. **55233 25/9; **57236 (6029) 14/9; **57238 (990) 25/9; **57309 (947) 16/9; **57368 (6005) 23/9; **57651 (1732) 21/9. On 30/9 a new departure was made when No. **40188 received 8' numerals and 6' letters. **Fitted with new smokebox numberplates. |
SLS/194811 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1911 |
To Service |
To service as Caledonian Railway Number 462 Built at St. Rollox Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 15212 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stirling (31B) |
|
|
11/09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 55212 |
|
|
01/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stirling (63B) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
04/12/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 55212 |
|
|