Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 3208 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 3208 Week
» 138024 Month
» 340688 Year
» 3367541 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Highland Railway |
139 |
m/e |
02/1900 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
17698 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
57698 |
on |
06/12/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Drummond |
Class |
K |
Company History |
HR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3847 |
To Service |
During 02/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 06/12/1951 off Hurlford (67B) |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 10 mths , 5 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
06/12/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
25/05/1947 |
Corkerhill MPD |
Six of the ex H. Rly. 'Barneys,' viz., Nos. 17694, 17695, 17697, 17698, 17699 and 17702, were seen on shed here on 25/5. Nos. 17695 and 17699 still have the safety valves on the dome, while No. 17697 has a stovepipe chimney. |
SLS/194708 |
03/12/1948 |
St. Rollox Works |
No. 54767 Clan Mackinnon was despatched on 19/11, still retaining L.M.S. on the tender (No. 2689), after having received attention to the boiler. Another interesting engine ex Works during the same week was 'Clan' goods, No. 57955. Both engines had been fitted with smokebox numberplates. No. 15053 is still in the dump, while the boiler is undergoing repair. The inner firebox is being almost renewed by getting new tube and door plates, and new half sides. The engine is soon to enter the shops for a general repair. A further ex H.R. engine to come in for service repair was No. 17698 (30A), which arrived on 4/11 and was despatched on 25/11. No. 5716 is still in the shops, having been brought in from the dump on 12/10. Additional locomotives painted black and fully lined are:-Nos. 55145 an 55231. |
SLS/194901 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Highland Railway Number 139 Built at Dübs & Co, Works Number 3847 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 17698 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Corkerhill (30A) |
|
|
20/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hurlford (67B) |
|
|
06/12/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 57698 from Hurlford (67B) |
|
|
06/12/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 57698 |
|
|