|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1949 | St. Rollox Works | Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 40186, 590, 617/27, 41175, 1184, 2195, 2694, 2746, 42809, 2831, 4794, 44960/92, 45007/09/87, 45123/24/38, 45389, 45452/69, 45471/72/82/86/92, 46221, 14472, 15140, 15213, 16243/59, 56261, 16306/53/55, 17246, 17339/64, 57556, 17602/26/40/68. St. Rollox have now started using the B.R. crest, but as yet none of the ex-C.R. locomotives has received one. Two of the diesel railcars are laid up at St. Rollox, and the third at Hamilton. It is rumoured that one is to be broken up | SLS/194912 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1892 | To Service | To service as Caledonian Railway Number 547 Built at St. Rollox Works |
||
1907 | Modification | Modification: Unspecified rebuilding undertaken | ||
1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 17339 | ||
12/03/1949 | Allocation | |||
05/11/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 57339 | ||
11/08/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stirling (63B) | ||
09/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stirling (63B) | ||
30/06/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 57339 | ||
07/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |