Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 1110 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31760 Week
» 130405 Month
» 333069 Year
» 3359922 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4421 |
m/e |
10/1927 |
British Railways |
44421 |
w/e |
18/02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 10/1927 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 12/12/1964 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 2 mths , 12 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
8E |
Brunswick |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
ALLOC |
5D |
Stoke |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
ALLOC |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
4w/e |
04/09/1954 |
ALLOC |
17A |
Derby |
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
ALLOC |
17C |
Rowsley |
4w/e |
27/01/1962 |
ALLOC |
15E |
Coalville |
5w/e |
06/06/1964 |
ALLOC |
5D |
Stoke |
4w/e |
07/11/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/12/1960 |
Bolton MPD |
Ex-Horwich Works on Bolton (26C) Shed: 42753, 42843, 44421. |
SLS/196102 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4421 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Heaton Mersey (19D) |
|
|
18/02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44421 |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brunswick (8E) |
|
|
27/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
11/09/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
01/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
06/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rowsley (17C) |
|
|
09/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Coalville (15E) |
|
|
07/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
12/12/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44421 |
|
|
04/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|