Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 458 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 458 Week
» 135274 Month
» 337938 Year
» 3364791 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
4541 |
m/e |
10/1928 |
British Railways |
44541 |
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 10/1928 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 09/11/1963 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 1 mth , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
23B |
Aintree |
w/e |
11/10/1947 |
ALLOC |
27E |
Walton on the Hill |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
ALLOC |
17B |
Burton |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
ALLOC |
18A |
Toton |
4w/e |
01/06/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
09/11/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4541 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B) |
|
|
30/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 44541 |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (27E) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
01/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
09/11/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 44541 |
|
|
02/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|