Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 4461 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 35111 Week
» 133756 Month
» 336420 Year
» 3363273 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
100 |
m/e |
06/1895 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12280 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52280 |
w/e |
08/01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
11 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
23 |
Works Number |
375 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1895 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 24/03/1951 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 9 mths , 21 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
24/03/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1895 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 100 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 375 |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12280 |
|
|
08/02/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
11/04/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E) |
|
|
08/01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52280 |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52280 |
|
|