Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1102 Today
» 5521 Yesterday
» 1102 Week
» 135918 Month
» 338582 Year
» 3365435 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
16413 |
m/e |
07/1926 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
7330 |
y/e |
1934 |
British Railways |
47330 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1966 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
5D |
Stoke |
4w/e |
30/07/1960 |
ALLOC |
5B |
Crewe South |
5w/e |
05/08/1961 |
ALLOC |
CreweWorks |
|
4w/e |
02/05/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/08/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 16413 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23409 |
|
|
1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7330 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47330 |
|
|
16/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
05/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
25/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Works (99C) |
|
|
07/08/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47330 |
|
|
01/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|