Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1885 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 27919 Week
» 126564 Month
» 329228 Year
» 3356081 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
16450 |
m/e |
08/1926 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
7367 |
y/e |
1934 |
British Railways |
47367 |
m/e |
04/1950 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1967 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 16450 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23446 |
|
|
1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7367 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47367 |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brunswick (8E) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
20/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G) |
|
|
03/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (8L) |
|
|
12/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47367 |
|
|
04/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|