Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 118 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 30768 Week
» 129413 Month
» 332077 Year
» 3358930 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
16461 |
m/e |
10/1926 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
7378 |
y/e |
1934 |
British Railways |
47378 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
35 |
Works Number |
3949 |
To Service |
During 10/1926 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 20/11/1965 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 1 mth , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1966 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1926 |
2A |
|
Rugby |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
1A |
|
Willesden |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
10C |
|
Patricroft |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
20/11/1965 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
1A |
Willesden |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
ALLOC |
10C |
Patricroft |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
20/11/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 16461 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3949 |
|
|
1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7378 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rugby (2A) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47378 |
|
|
18/04/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (10C) |
|
|
20/11/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47378 |
|
|
02/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|