Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1257 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31907 Week
» 130552 Month
» 333216 Year
» 3360069 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
16462 |
m/e |
10/1926 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
7379 |
y/e |
1934 |
British Railways |
47379 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
35 |
Works Number |
3950 |
To Service |
During 10/1926 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 18/11/1963 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 1 mth , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1926 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 16462 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3950 |
|
|
1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7379 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rugby (2A) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47379 |
|
|
29/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford (5C) |
|
|
21/05/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
03/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
01/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (56E) |
|
|
17/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
18/11/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47379 |
|
|
02/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|