Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 3440 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 29474 Week
» 128119 Month
» 330783 Year
» 3357636 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
16529 |
m/e |
06/1927 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
7446 |
y/e |
1934 |
British Railways |
47446 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd. |
Order Number |
36 |
Works Number |
1530 |
To Service |
During 06/1927 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 20/12/1960 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 6 mths , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
20D |
Normanton |
4w/e |
30/10/1954 |
ALLOC |
56F |
Low Moor |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
20/12/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 16529 Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd., Works Number 1530 |
|
|
1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7446 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47446 |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Normanton (20D) |
|
|
10/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) |
|
|
20/12/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47446 |
|
|
01/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|